IL SB0598 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the University of Illinois Trustees Act. Provides that in order to determine residency status of a potential or current student trustee, the student must provide evidence of the student's Illinois domicile for at least the previous 6 months, and either (i) evidence of the student's current, valid Illinois driver's license or Illinois Identification Card or (ii) evidence of the student's valid Illinois voter registration (instead of having evidence of the student's Illinois domicile, Illinois driver's license, and Illinois voter registration positively demonstrate residency). Effective January 1, 2018.
Title
UNIV OF IL-STUDENT TRUSTEE
Sponsors
Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2017-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2017-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-05-15 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 015-000-000 |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-04-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 033-015-000 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 007-004-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 310 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |