IL SB0605 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires that each school district, charter school, or alternative school or any school receiving public funds develop an absenteeism and truancy policy to be communicated to students and their parents or guardians on an annual basis. Sets forth the minimum elements that must be included in the policy. Requires the policy to be updated every 2 years and filed with the State Board of Education. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
SCH CD-TRUANCY POLICY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0157 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2022 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 007-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 22-90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 26-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |