IL SB0610 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-07 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-07 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also commits aggravated battery when, in committing a battery, other than by the discharge of a firearm, he or she knowingly causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to an individual whom the person knows to be a Department of Children and Family Services employee: (1) performing his or her official duties; (2) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (3) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that a violation is a Class 1 felony. Provides that a person also commits aggravated battery when, in committing a battery, other than by discharge of a firearm, he or she knows the individual battered to be a Department of Children and Family Services employee: (1) performing his or her official duties; (2) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (3) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that a violation is a Class 2 felony.
Title
CRIM CD-AGG BAT DCFS EMPLOYEE
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Stewart [R] | Sen. Steve McClure [R] | Sen. Darren Bailey [R] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] |
Sen. Neil Anderson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-3.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=610&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0610.htm |