IL SB0665 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0455
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0455
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Assisted Living and Shared Housing Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning legislative purpose.
Title
LIQUOR-CRAFT DISTILLER LICENSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0455 |
2011-08-19 | Senate | Effective Date August 19, 2011 |
2011-08-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2011-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2011-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-03 | House | First Reading |
2011-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2011-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2011 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 008-004-000 |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2011-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 9 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |