IL SB0688 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Prompt Payment Act. Provides that by July 1, 2021, and by July 1 of each year thereafter, the State Comptroller shall determine the prompt payment interest rate for the fiscal year beginning on that July 1. Provides that any bill approved for payment on or after July 1, 2021 must be paid or the payment issued to the payee within 90 days of receipt of a proper bill or invoice. Provides that if payment is not issued to the payee within this 90-day period, an interest penalty calculated using the prompt payment interest rate shall be added for each month or fraction thereof after the end of this 90-day period until final payment is made. Provides for the prompt payment interest rate under the applicable provisions. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-PROMPT PAYMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 540 | 3-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=688&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0688.htm |