IL SB0688 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-27 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-27 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Cairo Development Authority Act. Creates the Cairo Development Authority for the purpose of facilitating and promoting the redevelopment of certain property in Cairo and the surrounding areas. Provides that the jurisdiction of the Authority extends over Alexander County. Provides that the Authority is governed by a 5-member Board of Directors. Sets forth the powers and responsibilities of the Authority, including the power to acquire, own, lease, sell, and dispose of real property and, under the supervision of the Illinois Finance Authority, the power to issue revenue bonds. Contains other provisions. Amends the Illinois Finance Authority Act. Provides that all bond issuances of the Cairo Development Authority are subject to supervision, management, control, and approval of the Illinois Finance Authority. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-27 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2023-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2023-04-18 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-31 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2023-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Doris Turner |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 510 | 0.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |