IL SB0727 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Drug Court Treatment Act. Eliminates the provision that excludes a defendant from a drug court program if the defendant has previously completed or has been discharged from a drug court program.
Title
DRUG COURT-ELIGIBILITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 012-000-000 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 166 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=727&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0727.htm |