IL SB0737 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a Section concerning child care for TANF recipients, makes a technical change in provisions for payment for child care by the Department of Human Services.
Title
PUBLIC AID-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b) |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 9A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |