IL SB0914 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
Pending: House Agriculture & Conservation Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
Pending: House Agriculture & Conservation Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. In a provision regarding special deer, turkey, and combination hunting permits, provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall, upon request, issue to 2 additional family member landowners, who own with other family member landowners a parcel of at least 40 acres but who do not all reside on that property, a landowner deer, turkey, and combination permit for hunting only on that property at a cost of no more than the regular permit fee. Defines "family member" and "family member landowner".
Title
WILDLIFE-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Doris Turner [D] | Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel [D] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] |
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Rep. Michael Kelly [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 012-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |