IL SB1055 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
GAMING-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan McConchie |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |