IL SB1134 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0539
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0539
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that if, in any action brought under the Judicial Foreclosure Article, a plaintiff files an affidavit showing that the defendant resides outside of or has left the State, or on due inquiry cannot be found, or is concealed within the State so that process cannot be served upon him or her, and stating the place of residence of the defendant or that the place of residence of the defendant cannot be ascertained, the plaintiff shall cause publication to be made in some newspaper published in the county in which the action is pending or, under certain circumstances, in a newspaper published in an adjoining county. Provides that the plaintiff shall, within 10 days of the first publication of the notice, send a copy by mail, addressed to each defendant whose place of residence is stated in the affidavit.
Title
FORECLOSURE-PUBLICATION-NOTICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0539 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-05-08 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-26 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 15-1101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |