IL SB1184 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Civil Service Commission for its FY 10 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
$CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Michael Madigan [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Schoenberg [D] | Sen. John Sullivan [D] |
Sen. Donne Trotter [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2010-11-12 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-11-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-10 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 | |
2010-11-10 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2011 | |
2009-08-16 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-30 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-30 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-30 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 | |
2009-05-29 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-05-28 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-28 | First Reading | |
2009-05-28 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-05-28 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-28 | Third Reading - Passed; 037-022-000 | |
2009-05-22 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 19, 2009 | |
2009-05-18 | Do Pass Appropriations II; 007-005-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Assigned to Appropriations II | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |