IL SB1191 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0082
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0082
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall adopt rules to maintain data on child care facilities without Internet access and shall ensure the child care facilities without Internet access register for available mailing lists of pertinent recalls distributed in paper form. Removes the requirement that the Illinois Department of Children and Family Services must make the comprehensive list of unsafe children's products available to those facilities that do not have Internet access. Effective immediately.
Title
CHILD CARE-UNSAFE PRODUCT LIST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0082 |
2013-07-15 | Senate | Effective Date July 15, 2013 |
2013-07-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-004-000 |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Josh Harms |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 10 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |