IL SB1221 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Defines the term, "smoking." Prohibits operation of a motor vehicle while a person is smoking in the vehicle and a person under the age of 18 is present in the vehicle. Provides that police officers may not stop or detain a motor vehicle or its driver for violation or suspected violation of this Section. Makes a violation of this Section a petty offense with a fine not to exceed $100.
Title
VEH CD-SMOKING IN MOTOR VEH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1221&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1221.htm |