IL SB1246 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the tax shall not apply to gross rental receipts received from the renting, leasing or letting of rooms to an entity that is organized and operated exclusively by an organization chartered by the United States Congress for the purpose of providing disaster relief and that possesses an active Exemption Identification Number issued by the Department of Revenue if the renting, leasing, or letting of the rooms is in furtherance of the purposes for which the exempt organization is organized. Effective immediately.
Title
HOTEL TAX-RED CROSS EXEMPT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 145 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1246&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1246.htm |