IL SB1257 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning the Senior Citizens Homestead Exemption, provides that in all counties (now, in counties with less than 3,000,000 inhabitants), the county board may by resolution provide that if a person has been granted a senior citizens homestead exemption, the person qualifying need not reapply for the exemption. Provides that the county recorder of deeds shall alert the assessor whenever the transfer of ownership of any property receiving a Senior Citizens Homestead Exemption has occurred. Provides that, if such a transfer occurs, the assessor shall remove the exemption and provide the new property owner with information concerning reapplication. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SENIOR HOMESTEAD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2019
2019-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000
2019-05-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-05-24SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-24HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-24HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-24HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-23HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-09HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-04-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-04-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-03-28HouseArrived in House
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-03-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-02-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2019
2019-02-21SenateDo Pass Revenue; 008-000-000
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-02-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-170Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback