IL SB1294 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Industrial Hemp Act. Provides that any person desiring to grow, process, cultivate, harvest, process, possess, sell, or purchase industrial hemp or industrial hemp related products must be licensed by the Department of Agriculture. Provides that the application for a license shall include the name and address of the applicant and the legal description of the land area to be used to grow or process industrial hemp and that the license shall be valid for a period of 5 years. Preempts home rule powers. Amends the Illinois Noxious Weed Law. Provides that "noxious weed" does not include industrial hemp. Amends the Cannabis Control Act. Provides that "cannabis" does not include industrial hemp.
Title
INDUSTRIAL HEMP ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 014-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 008-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
505 | 100 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 550 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |