IL SB1319 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Defines "greatest social need" for the purpose of a specified rule. Makes a conforming change. Amends the Assisted Living and Shared Housing Act. Prohibits unlawful discrimination by an owner, licensee, administrator, employee, or agent of an assisted living establishment of residents in assisted living establishments. Provides that unlawful discrimination does not include an action by an owner, licensee, administrator, employee, or agent that is required by the Act or rules adopted under the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ASSISTED LIVING-DISCRIMINATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-020-001
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
2019-04-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-04-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-04-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-04-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-04-10HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-03-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-05SenateDo Pass Human Services; 008-000-002
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201053Amended CodeCitation Text
201053.11New CodeSee Bill Text
210997New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback