IL SB1362 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Control Act. Provides that each Administrator shall post on his or her website: (1) all locations in the county that impound dogs and cats; (2) the operating hours of those locations; (3) the contact information for those locations; and (4) the applicable redemption fees for dogs and cats. Provides that any dog found to be vicious must be listed in a database by the Administrator or Director, along with any other dangerous wild animals. Provides that the database shall include the name, current address, contact information, and other pertinent information of the owner, and the database shall be made available to first responders in the region in order to put them on notice before they respond to a call to any location.
Title
ANIMAL CONTROL-DATABASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 006-003-000 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 5 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
510 | 5 | 15.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
510 | 5 | 2.11b-2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1362&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB1362.htm |