IL SB1392 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the University of Illinois Scientific Surveys Act. Provides that, subject to appropriation, the Prairie Research Institute shall conduct a detailed review of the available scientific literature and federal and State laws, regulations, and rules to identify the threat of microplastics to human health and the environment. Provides that no later than 3 months after completion of the review, the Prairie Research Institute shall submit to the General Assembly a report of its findings that must include any recommendations for legislative or regulatory actions that the State can take to protect human health and the environment from microplastics. Provides that the amendatory Act's provisions are repealed on July 1, 2021.
Title
PRAIRIE RESEARCH-MICROPLASTICS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0330 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 026-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-04-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |