IL SB1413 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0042
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0042
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Vital Records Act. Provides that a person shall not be required to pay a search fee for a birth record search or an additional fee for a certified copy of the record upon the person's release on parole, mandatory supervised release, final discharge, or pardon from the Department of Corrections if the person presents a specified form completed by the Department of Corrections.
Title
VITAL RECORDS-SEARCH PAROLEE
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Sen. Brian Stewart [R] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0042 |
2017-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2017-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 008-000-000 |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 005-000-000 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 535 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |