IL SB1429 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides an exception for a law enforcement officer or an operator of an authorized emergency vehicle performing his or her official duties to a provision prohibiting a person from leaving a vehicle unattended without first stopping the engine and removing the key from the ignition. Provides that an unattended vehicle shall not include an unattended locked motor vehicle with the engine running after being started by a remote starter system. Defines "remote starter system". Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-REMOTE STARTER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0435 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-18 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-05-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-171.01d | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 11-1401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-1429 | Amended Code | Citation Text |