IL SB1461 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning a reduced extension for a school district's educational purposes, provides that the Section applies if the school district's final percent of adequacy (currently, adequacy target) exceeds 110%. Provides that the referendum petition for the reduction shall be submitted to and certified by the school board's secretary (currently, the applicable election authority). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-EDUCATION PURPOSES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-27 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-03-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-03-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 015-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |