IL SB1490 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill, and further modifies the term "local farm or food products" to include products processed and packaged in Illinois using at least one ingredient grown in Illinois.
Title
LOCAL FARM AND FOOD PRODUCTS
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Fowler [R] | Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] |
Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 595 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |