IL SB1496 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Increases the penalty for violating the Section regarding use of due caution in approaching or entering a highway construction or maintenance area or zone from a maximum fine of $10,000 to a maximum fine of $25,000. Provides that the driver of a vehicle shall avoid encroaching upon any designated highway construction or maintenance zone, and violators shall be fined no less than $100 and no more than $1,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-CONSTRUCTION ZONE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-30SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0172
2019-07-30SenateEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-07-30SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-20SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-001
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-04-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2019-04-16HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-10HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 018-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Transportation
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Transportation
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Transportation
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-908Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback