IL SB1497 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that medical services provided under the medical assistance program may include dental services provided by an individual licensed to practice dentistry or dental surgery and that "dental services" means diagnostic, preventive, or corrective procedures provided by or under the supervision of a dentist in the practice of his or her profession. Provides that dental services for persons who are participating in education, training, or employment programs operated by the Department of Human Services shall be provided by or under the supervision of a dentist (instead of providing that such dental services shall include but not be limited to prosthodontics).
Title
DHFS-MEDICAID-DENTAL SERVICES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-07 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0156 | |
2009-08-07 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-07 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-05-14 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-14 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-002-003 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-06 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-04-23 | Re-assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-26 | First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-26 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2009-03-26 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2009 | |
2009-03-05 | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |