IL SB1497 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Provides that there shall be an irrevocable and continuing appropriation of all amounts necessary from the State Lottery Fund to the Department of the Lottery for payment of prizes to holders of winning lottery tickets or shares, including multi-state lottery game tickets, related operating expenses for multi-state games, and payment of promotional or incentive prizes associated with the sale of lottery tickets, and the irrevocable and continuing authority for and direction to the Comptroller and to the Treasurer of the State to make the necessary transfers out of and disbursements from the State Lottery Fund for that purpose. Effective immediately.
Title
LOTTERY-CONTINUING APPROP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1497&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1497.htm |