IL SB1511 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Biometric Privacy Information Act. Defines "security purpose" as the purpose of preventing retail theft, fraud, or any other misappropriation or theft of a thing of value, including protecting property from trespass, controlling access to property, protecting any person from harm, including stalking, violence, or harassment, and assisting a law enforcement investigation. Allows a private entity to collect, capture, or otherwise obtain a person's or customer's biometric identifier or biometric information without satisfying other specified requirements if: (1) the private entity collects, captures, or otherwise obtains a person's or customer's biometric identifier or biometric information for a security purpose; (2) the private entity uses the biometric identifier or biometric information only for a security purpose; (3) the private entity retains the biometric identifier or biometric information no longer than is reasonably necessary to satisfy a security purpose; and (4) the private entity documents a process and time frame to delete any biometric identifier or biometric information.
Title
BIPA-SECURITY PURPOSES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-22 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Privacy |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 14 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 14 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1511&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1511.htm |