IL SB1515 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-08 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-08 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that beginning January 1, 2010, the physician fee schedule for the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Program and for pediatric physician specialists under the medical assistance program must increase to become competitive with those of non-governmental, third-party health insurance programs. Provides that by January 1, 2012, the payment for a pediatric specialty physician service must not be lower than Medicare reimbursement in accordance with the Medicare payment localities for Illinois. Provides that the Department shall annually increase pediatric specialty physician payments under the provisions of the Act by an amount approximately equal to one-third of the difference between the actual rates available for such purposes on January 1, 2009 and the Medicare reimbursement rates effective on January 1, 2007. Makes other changes.
Title
INS-PEDIATRIC SPECIALIST FEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-13 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-12 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-03-11 | To Human Services Subcommittee on Medicaid & Provider Rate Reform | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Human Services Subcommittee on Medicaid & Provider Rate Reform | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services | |
2009-03-10 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-02-24 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1515&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1515.htm |