IL SB1559 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Eviction Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Deletes language providing that a landlord shall have the power to bar the presence of a person from the premises owned by the landlord who is not a tenant or lessee or who is not a member of the tenant's or lessee's household. Deletes language providing that a landlord may give notice to a person that the person is barred from the premises owned by the landlord and providing criminal penalties for further trespass after the notice has been given. Provides instead that nothing precludes a landlord from exercising any rights the landlord may have under existing local, State, federal, or common law to bar from the property an individual who is not a tenant or member of the tenant's household, if that individual's presence on the property poses a direct threat to: (1) any tenant's health, safety, or right to quiet enjoyment of the premises; or (2) the health or safety of the landlord or the landlord's employees.
Title
EVICTION-BARRING PERSONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Judiciary- Property Law |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 9-106.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1559&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1559.htm |