IL SB1583 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cook County Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Deletes a prohibition on the use of county funds, other than those funds raised by the tax levied by the county under that Article, in order to make the required contribution by the county. Provides that, in lieu of levying all or a portion of the required tax in any year, the county may deposit with the county treasurer no later than March 1 of that year for the benefit of the Cook County Employees' and Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund an amount that, together with the levied tax for that year, is not less than the amount of the county's contribution for that year, as certified to the county board by the Board of Trustees of the Cook County Employees' and Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund. Authorizes the deposit to be derived from any source legally available for that purpose, including, but not limited to, the proceeds of county borrowings. Provides that such a deposit shall, to the extent of the amounts so deposited, satisfy the requirement to levy a tax for that year. Limits the concurrent exercise of home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-COOK CTY-FUND DEPOSIT
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Jacobs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Pensions and Investments |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Pensions and Investments |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions and Investments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 9-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1583&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB1583.htm |