IL SB1586 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Clinical Psychologist Licensing Act. In provisions concerning written collaborative agreements, removes a provision prohibiting a prescribing psychologist from prescribing medications to patients who are less than 17 years of age or over 65 years of age. Provides that no prescriptive authority for any Schedule II opioid shall be delegated. Provides that after the collaborating physician files a notice delegating authority to prescribe any nonnarcotic, nonopioid Schedule II through V controlled substances (rather than any nonnarcotic Schedule III through V controlled substances), the licensed clinical psychologist shall be eligible to register for a mid-level practitioner controlled substance license under the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Defines "opioid". Makes corresponding changes in the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall provide coverage and reimbursement for prescription management services provided by prescribing psychologists for persons who are otherwise eligible for medical assistance under the Article. Effective immediately.
Title
CLINIC PSYC-NO PRESCRIP OPIOID
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Behavioral and Mental Health |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 15 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 4.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 303.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1586&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1586.htm |