IL SB1591 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Charter Schools Law of the School Code. Requires a charter school proposal to include disclosure of any known active criminal or civil investigation by a local, state, or federal law enforcement agency into the individual or organization submitting the charter school proposal. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-CHARTER SCH PROPOSAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0334 |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date August 10, 2015 |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2015-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-011-000 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Charter School Policy Committee; 008-000-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Charter School Policy Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported Back To Education; 003-000-000 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Charter Schools |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27A-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |