IL SB1691 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-22 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-22 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, if a veteran with a surviving spouse was in the process of review to receive the homestead exemption for veterans with disabilities, but the veteran died before the exemption was approved, then the application process shall continue and any subsequent approval granted to the veteran shall carry over to the spouse as long as the spouse meets the requirements for carry over.
Title
PROP TX-VETERANS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |