IL SB1743 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, on and after January 1, 2008, with respect to sales of cellular telephones and other wireless cellular devices, the terms "selling price" and "gross receipts" do not include consideration paid by a third-party cellular service provider. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TAX-CELLULAR DEVICES
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] | Rep. Chad Hays [R] |
Rep. David Leitch [R] | Rep. David Reis [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2013-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-02 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2013-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2013-04-29 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2013-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-001 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2013 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 007-003-001 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |