IL SB1754 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a health benefit plan or health carrier, including, but not limited to, a preferred provider organization, an independent physician association, a third-party administrator, or any entity that contracts with licensed health care providers shall not impose any fixed co-payment that exceeds 50% of the total billed charges for health care services provided to an insured or enrolled during a visit to a health care provider.
Title
INS CD-COPAYMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Insurance Mandates and Special Issues |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1754&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB1754.htm |