IL SB1831 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that the definition of "beer" includes beverages brewed or fermented wholly or in part from malt products. Provides that a caterer retailer license shall allow the holder, a distributor, or an importing distributor to transfer any inventory to and from the holder's retail premises and to purchase alcoholic liquor from a distributor or importing distributor to be delivered directly to an off-site event. Provides that a special use permit license shall allow the holder to purchase alcoholic liquor from a distributor or importing distributor to be delivered directly to the location specified in the special use permit license. Provides that a special use permit license shall allow the holder, a distributor, or an importing distributor to transfer any inventory from the premises specified in the special use permit license to its retail premises. Provides that, if certain conditions are met, nothing in the Act prohibits a distributor or importing distributor from offering a credit or a refund for unused, salable beer to a special use permit licensee or a caterer retailer or a special use permit licensee or caterer retailer from accepting the credit or refund. In a provision that allows a manufacturer, distributor, or importing distributor to provide permanent outdoor signs to retailers if certain conditions are met, provides that the permanent outside sign shall cost not more than $3,000 per brand (instead of per manufacturer). Contains provisions concerning the servicing of certain systems by a manufacturer, distributor, or importing distributor. Prohibits a distributor or importing distributor from selling or giving coil cleaning services to certain licensees. Authorizes a manufacturer, distributor, or importing distributor to give, sell, or lease dispensing equipment to specified licensees if certain requirements are met. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0016
2019-06-14SenateEffective Date June 14, 2019
2019-06-14SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-05SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2019-05-23SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-23SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2019
2019-05-23SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000
2019-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Muñoz
2019-04-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass Executive; 018-000-000
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23551-3.04Amended CodeCitation Text
23555-1Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-6Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-6.5Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-6.6New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1831&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1831.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1831eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1831enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0016.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1831sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1831ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1831_04102019_075000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1831_05232019_040000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1831ham001_05292019_043000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback