IL SB1838 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Act and the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that if there is a conflict between the provisions of the Department of Veterans Affairs Act and the provisions of the Nursing Home Care Act concerning an Illinois Veterans Home operated by the Illinois Department of Veterans' Affairs, then the provisions of the Department of Veterans Affairs Act shall apply. Provides that an Illinois Veterans Home licensed under the Nursing Home Care Act and operated by the Illinois Department of Veterans' Affairs is exempt from certain provisions of the Nursing Home Care Act, including provisions concerning license fees, licensing by municipalities, facility plan review, annual financial statements, violations and penalties, and actions by residents for injunctive and declaratory relief. Provides that such a Home is also exempt from provisions of the Nursing Home Care Act concerning standards for facilities, so long as the Home meets the standards for similar provisions required or regulated by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs. Effective immediately.
Title
DPT VET AFF-IDPH-VETS HOMES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1838&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1838.htm |