IL SB1848 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Prompt Payment Act. Provides that the term "goods or services furnished to the State" includes, but is not limited to, services concerning prevention, intervention, or treatment services and supports for youth provided by a vendor by virtue of a contractual grant agreement. Includes invoices issued under a contractual grant agreement in the definition of "a proper bill or invoice".
Title
PROMPT PAYMENT-GRANT AGREEMNTS
Sponsors
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Ira Silverstein [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] |
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-001-000 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 540 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1848&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1848.htm |