IL SB1877 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Sexual Harassment Victim Representation Act. Prohibits unions from designating the same union representative to represent both a victim of sexual harassment and the alleged perpetrator in any disciplinary proceeding.
Title
SEX HARASSMENT REPRESENTATION
Sponsors
Sen. John Curran [R] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Dale Righter [R] |
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-04-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |