IL SB1932 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that if the licensee is an Illinois resident who has moved to another state, the Illinois State Police shall issue the renewed license with the person's new address if the licensee has completed the 3 hours of training required under the Act. Provides that the renewed license shall be valid for a period of 5 years.
Title
CONCEALED CARRY-MOVED LICENSEE
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | To Executive- Firearms |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1932&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1932.htm |