IL SB1973 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Home Birth Safety Act. Provides for the licensure of midwives by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation and for certain limitations on the activities of licensed midwives. Creates the Illinois Midwifery Board. Sets forth provisions concerning application, qualifications, grounds for disciplinary action, and administrative procedures. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to set a repeal date for the new Act of January 1, 2030. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987, the Nurse Practice Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code to make related changes.
Title
HOME BIRTH SAFETY ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 50-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1973&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1973.htm |