IL SB2037 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Notary Public Act. Provides that every company, corporation, association, organization, or person that remits notary public applications to the Secretary of State on behalf of applicants for appointment and commission as a notary public, for compensation or otherwise, shall comply with standards to qualify for licensure as a notary public remittance agent. Provides standards to qualify for licensure as a notary public remittance agent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NOTARY PUBLIC REMITTANCE AGENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000
2019-05-14HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-14HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Civil Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-08HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2019-05-08HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000
2019-05-01HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Crowe
2019-04-04SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-03-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-000-000
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-02-15SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steven M. Landek

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53122-107New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback