IL SB2038 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. In provisions concerning epinephrine administration, provides that epinephrine may be administered with a glass vial, auto-injector, ampule, or pre-filled syringe. Makes conforming changes.
Title
EPINEPHRINE ADMINISTRATION ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Public Health |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Public Health |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 22-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |