IL SB2041 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Establishes standards with respect to cannabis for impairment sufficient to bar compensation for injuries to employees who are intoxicated. Provides that the presence of 5 nanograms of tetrahydrocannabinol in the blood or 10 nanograms of tetrahydrocannabinol in other bodily substances shall create a rebuttable presumption that intoxication is the proximate cause of the injury. Contains the statement: "Authorized use may be evidenced only by written consent by the employer to the employee, which consent shall not be unreasonably withheld".
Title
WORK COMP IMPAIRMENT STANDARD
Sponsors
Sen. Donald DeWitte [R] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
Sen. Jason Plummer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Executive- Cannabis |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2041&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2041.htm |