IL SB2214 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes to the Certified Anesthesiologist Assistant Practice Act: Requires all anesthesiologist assistant applicants and licensees to (i) provide a valid address and email address to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation, which shall serve as the address of record and email address of record, respectively, at the time of application for licensure or renewal of a license; and (ii) inform the Department of any change of address of record or email address of record within 14 days after such change. Adds provisions concerning the Department's powers and duties under the Act; rules on the maximum number of certified anesthesiologist assistants that may be supervised by a supervising anesthesiologist; qualifications for licensure; criminal history records background checks; the endorsement of certified anesthesiologist assistants licensed in other jurisdictions; fees and fines collected under the Act; Department rules on continuing education requirements; injunctions and cease and desist orders; Department investigations and hearings; records of proceedings; the Department's subpoena power; hearing findings and recommendations; hearing officer appointments; the restoration of a suspended or revoked license; the judicial review of final administrative decisions; confidentiality standards; home rule preemption; and other matters. Removes a provision establishing a Certified Anesthesiologist Assistant Advisory Committee. Further amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. In provisions concerning the Illinois State Medical Board, changes the number of board members from 17 to 18. Changes the maximum number of members who must be State residents from 8 to 9. Provides that one board member shall be a certified anesthesiologist assistant licensed to practice in Illinois. Further amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Provides for repeal of the Certified Anesthesiologist Assistant Practice Act on January 1, 2028 (rather than January 1, 2033).
Title
CERT ANESTHESIOLOGIST ASSIST
Sponsors
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Javier Cervantes [D] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] |
Sen. Dave Syverson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2023 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 009-000-000 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Licensed Activities |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Licensed Activities |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 5 | 6.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 85 | 10.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 54.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 54.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 80 | 4.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |