IL SB2247 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that the Code does not apply to the leasing of State-owned facilities by a wireless carrier. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates credit for the cost of equipment and materials used in the business of providing broadband services in a county in the State with a population of fewer than 40,000 people or a township in the State with a population density of less than 50 households per square mile in a county with a population of less than 300,000 people. Provides that the credit does not apply to equipment and materials placed in service after December 31, 2026. Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act to exempt equipment and materials used to provide broadband services in a county in the State with a population of fewer than 40,000 people or a township in the State with a population density of less than 50 households per square mile in a county with a population of less than 300,000 people. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-BROADBAND INVESTMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Re-assigned to Revenue |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |