IL SB2259 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that teachers must be provided with and a teacher must annually complete 20 hours of inservice training, 10 hours of which a teacher may complete through online learning if the online learning requires proof of proficiency. With respect to the opening date of a school term, provides that student instruction may begin no earlier than the day after Labor Day. Requires the calendar for a school term to provide for a minimum of 880 instructional hours in no more than 176 days of actual pupil attendance and at least 45 professional development hours for teachers, to be scheduled as any collective bargaining agreement allows; makes related changes. Provides that as part of its calendar for the school term, a school board shall schedule 5 emergency closure days, and the school board shall adopt a contingency plan for when emergency closure days are used during a school year to make up for a minimum of 25 lost instructional hours. Effective July 1, 2013.
Title
SCH CD-TEACHERS-SCH CALENDAR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-19.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 3-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |