IL SB2267 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that members of the General Assembly and the offices Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Attorney General, Secretary of State, Comptroller, and Treasurer shall be elected by ranked-choice voting. Provides for ranked-choice ballots to be produced. Provides that voters may rank their choice for candidates for those offices and provides for interpretations of certain ballot marks. Provides that tallying ranked-choice votes proceeds in rounds. Provides that in each round, the number of votes for each continuing candidate must be counted, that each continuing ballot counts as one vote for its highest-ranked continuing candidate for that round, and that exhausted ballots are not counted for any continuing candidate. Provides that if only 2 candidates remain, the candidate with the higher vote total wins, and that if more than 2 candidates remain, the last-place candidate is eliminated and another round of tallying is to commence. Provides that rounds continue until a winner is found. Makes conforming changes.
Title
ELEC CD-RANKED CHOICE VOTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-02-19 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 16-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 16-4.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 17-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 17-18.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 18-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 18-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2267&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2267.htm |