IL SB2272 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that a contractor that provides equipment and services for automated law enforcement, automated speed enforcement, or automated railroad grade crossing enforcement systems to municipalities or counties or any political action committee created by such a contractor may not make a campaign contribution to any political committee established to promote the candidacy of a candidate or public official in an aggregate value over $500 in a calendar year. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a municipality's or county's automated speed enforcement system or automated traffic law ordinance shall require that the determination to issue a citation be vested solely with the municipality or county and that such authority may not be delegated to any contractor retained by the municipality or county. Provides that any contract or agreement violating such a provision in the ordinance is null and void. Provides that signage at an intersection informing drivers of an automated traffic law enforcement system shall also inform drivers whether, following a stop, a right turn at the intersection is permitted or prohibited. Requires a statistical analysis of automated traffic law and speed enforcement systems every 3 years. Provides that no officer or employee of a municipality or county shall knowingly accept employment or receive compensation or fees for services from a contractor that provides automated enforcement system equipment or services to municipalities or counties until 2 years immediately after the termination of municipal or county employment. Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
RED LIGHT CAMERAS-ETHICS
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 9-50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2272&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2272.htm |